EP0018656 - Weighing scales for use in areas in danger of explosion [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.05.1984 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.08.1984 [1984/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sartorius GmbH. Weender Landstrasse 94-108 D-3400 Göttingen / DE | [1980/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Knothe, Erich Hasenwinkel 4 D-3406 Bovenden 1 / DE | 02 /
Blawert, Dieter Karl-Methe-Strasse 12 D-3400 Göttingen / DE | [1980/23] | Representative(s) | Köhler, Rudolf c/o Sartorius GmbH Weender Landstrasse 94-108 37070 Göttingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/23] | Köhler, Rudolf c/o Sartorius GmbH Weender Landstrasse 94-108 D-37070 Göttingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 80102406.8 | 03.05.1980 | [1980/23] | Priority number, date | DE19790013203U | 08.05.1979 Original published format: DE 7913203 U | [1980/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0018656 | Date: | 12.11.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0018656 | Date: | 27.07.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.1980 | Classification | IPC: | G01G21/28, G01G21/24 | [1980/23] | CPC: |
G01G21/244 (EP,US);
G01G21/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1980/23] | Title | German: | Waage zum Einsatz in explosionsgefährdeten Bereichen | [1980/23] | English: | Weighing scales for use in areas in danger of explosion | [1980/23] | French: | Balance utilisable dans des zônes à danger d'explosion | [1980/23] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 29.04.1981 | Examination requested [1981/46] | 01.08.1981 | Request for decision received: (all rights) | 11.09.1981 | Result of request for decision ((all rights)): Request granted | 03.06.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.08.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.01.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.04.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1982 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   18.06.1982 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2214418 [ ] (HOEFLIGER & KARG); | CH604143 [ ] (METTLER INSTRUMENTE AG); | US3444943 [ ] (TYTUS HULBERT T); | DE2460734 [ ] (SAUTER AUGUST GMBH); | DE1084046 [ ] (SCHENCK GMBH CARL); | FR1199877 [ ] (MOLINS MACHINE CO LTD) |