EP0019223 - Optically active hydantoin derivatives, their synthesis, pharmaceutical formulations containing them, and intermediates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.07.1981 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE WELLCOME FOUNDATION LIMITED Unicorn House 160 Euston Road P.O. Box 129 London NW1 2BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1980/24] | For all designated states THE WELLCOME FOUNDATION LIMITED Unicorn House 160 Euston Road London NW1 2BP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Whittaker, Norman 37 Brabourne Rise Beckenham, Kent / GB | [1980/24] | Representative(s) | Berg, Wilhelm, et al Patentanwälte Dr. Berg Dipl.-Ing. Stapf Dipl.-Ing. Schwabe Dr. Dr. Sandmair Postfach 86 02 45 Stuntzstrasse 16 D-8000 München 86 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/24] | Berg, Wilhelm, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dr. Berg Dipl.-Ing. Stapf Dipl.-Ing. Schwabe Dr. Dr. Sandmair Postfach 86 02 45 Stuntzstrasse 16 D-8000 München 86 / DE | Application number, filing date | 80102536.2 | 08.05.1980 | [1980/24] | Priority number, date | GB19790016023 | 09.05.1979 Original published format: GB 7916023 | [1980/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0019223 | Date: | 26.11.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.1980 | Classification | IPC: | C07D233/78, A61K31/415, C07C127/15, C07C101/20 | [1980/24] | CPC: |
A61K31/535 (EP);
A61K31/415 (EP);
A61K31/485 (EP);
A61K31/505 (EP);
A61K31/52 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D233/78 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/535, A61K31/52, A61K31/505, A61K31/485, A61K31/44, A61K31/415 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, SE [1980/24] | Title | German: | Optisch aktive Hydantoinderivate, ihre Herstellung, sie enthaltende pharmazeutische Formulierungen und Zwischenprodukte | [1980/24] | English: | Optically active hydantoin derivatives, their synthesis, pharmaceutical formulations containing them, and intermediates | [1980/24] | French: | Dérivés d'hydantoine optiquement actifs, leur préparation, compositions pharmaceutiques les contenant, et intermédiaires | [1980/24] | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 25.05.1981 | Examination requested [1981/32] | 19.06.1981 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1981/39] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0002258 [ ] (WELLCOME FOUND [GB]); | DE2922070 [ ] (WELLCOME FOUND); | DE2724948 [ ] (WELLCOME FOUND); | EP0003410 [ ] (BEECHAM GROUP LTD [GB]); | DE2755771 [ ] (BEECHAM GROUP LTD) |