EP0019225 - Process for the preparation of N-vinyl-N-alkyl carboxylic acid amides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/24] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jensen, Harald, Dr. Egerländer Strasse 37 D-6233 Kelkheim (Taunus) / DE | 02 /
Schmidt, Erwin, Dr. Am Flachsland 26 D-6233 Kelkheim (Taunus) / DE | 03 /
Mitzlaff, Michael, Dr. Berliner Strasse 26 D-6380 Bad Homburg / DE | 04 /
Cramer, Jürgen, Dr. Bergstrasse 27 D-6239 Eppstein/Taunus / DE | 05 /
Pistorius, Rudolf, Dr. Ausserhalb D-6352 Ober-Mörlen / DE | 06 /
Pietsch, Hartmut, Dr. Kantstrasse 14 D-6238 Hofheim am Taunus / DE | 07 /
Dehmer, Klaus, Dr. Falkensteiner Strasse 20 D-6233 Kelkheim (Taunus) / DE | [1980/24] | Application number, filing date | 80102538.8 | 08.05.1980 | [1980/24] | Priority number, date | DE19792919755 | 16.05.1979 Original published format: DE 2919755 | [1980/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0019225 | Date: | 26.11.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0019225 | Date: | 24.03.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.08.1980 | Classification | IPC: | C07C103/365, C07C103/38, C07C102/00 | [1980/24] | CPC: |
C07C231/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1980/24] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von N-Vinyl-N-alkyl-carbonsäureamiden | [1980/24] | English: | Process for the preparation of N-vinyl-N-alkyl carboxylic acid amides | [1980/24] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation d'amides N-vinyl-N-alkyl-carboxyliques | [1980/24] | Examination procedure | 20.12.1980 | Examination requested [1981/10] | 20.08.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.09.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.12.1982 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1235893 [ ] (HOECHST AG); | US3377340 [ ] (ROBERT HARTWIMMER, et al); | GB1125324 [ ] (HOECHST AG); | DE1445737 [ ] (HOECHST AG); | DE1545798 [ ] (HOECHST AG); | DE2113338 [ ] (HOECHST AG) |