EP0020986 - Process for manufacturing slot-nozzle elements for separating gaseous or vaporous mixtures, especially isotope mixtures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KERNFORSCHUNGSZENTRUM KARLSRUHE GMBH Postfach 36 40 D-76050 Karlsruhe / DE | [1981/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Becker, Erwin-Willy, Prof. Dr. Strählerweg 18 D-7500 Karlsruhe / DE | 02 /
Ehrfeld, Wolfgang, Dr. Dipl.Phys. Reutstrasse 27 D-7500 Karlsruhe / DE | 03 /
Krieg, Gunther, Dr. Dipl.Phys. Im Rennich 12 D-7500 Karlsruhe / DE | 04 /
Bier, Wilhelm, Dr. Dipl.Phys. Grabener Weg 10 D-7514 Eggenstein-Leopoldshafen / DE | [1981/01] | Application number, filing date | 80102603.0 | 10.05.1980 | [1981/01] | Priority number, date | DE19792922642 | 02.06.1979 Original published format: DE 2922642 | [1981/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0020986 | Date: | 07.01.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0020986 | Date: | 29.12.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.1980 | Classification | IPC: | B01D59/00, G03F1/02 | [1981/01] | CPC: |
B01D59/18 (EP,US);
B01D53/00 (EP,US);
Y10S205/918 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1981/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen von Trenndüsenelementen zur Trennung gas- oder dampfförmiger Gemische, insbesondere Isotopengemische | [1981/01] | English: | Process for manufacturing slot-nozzle elements for separating gaseous or vaporous mixtures, especially isotope mixtures | [1981/01] | French: | Procédé pour produire des éléments de tuyères de séparation pour la séparation des mélanges gazeux ou vaporeux, notamment des mélanges isotopiques | [1981/01] | Examination procedure | 29.10.1980 | Examination requested [1981/02] | 15.07.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.04.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 01.07.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DD127137 [ ] (ELEKTROMAT VEB); | DE2018725 [ ]; | DE952496 [ ] (RUETGER WEVER DR); | DD103977 [ ]; | DE2227342 [ ] (IBM); | DE2261123 [ ] (IBM); | DE2019201 [ ]; | US3925677 [ ] (FRASER DAVID BRUCE) |