EP0021036 - Tamper-proof plastics closure cap for bottles, particularly for those containing mineral water, beer and the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.1986 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Di Nunzio, Giuseppe Via Filadelfia 130 I-10137 Torino / IT | [1981/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1981/01] | Representative(s) | Aprà, Andrea, et al Via Cernaia 27 I-10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1981/01] | Aprà, Andrea, Dipl.-Ing. Dr. jur., et al Via Cernaia 27 I-10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 80102801.0 | 21.05.1980 | [1981/01] | Priority number, date | IT19790053340 | 18.06.1979 Original published format: IT 5334079 | [1981/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0021036 | Date: | 07.01.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0021036 | Date: | 02.05.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.1980 | Classification | IPC: | B65D41/18 | [1981/01] | CPC: |
B65D41/48 (EP,US);
B65D2401/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1981/01] | Title | German: | Garantie-Verschlusskapsel aus Kunstharz für Flaschen, insbesondere für Mineralwasser, Bier u. dgl. Getränke enthaltende Flaschen | [1981/01] | English: | Tamper-proof plastics closure cap for bottles, particularly for those containing mineral water, beer and the like | [1981/01] | French: | Capsule de fermeture inviolable en matière plastique pour bouteilles, notamment pour celles contenant de l'eau minérale, de la bière, etc. | [1981/01] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 30.06.1981 | Examination requested [1981/38] | 05.04.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.09.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.10.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.02.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.04.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.05.1985 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | DE1432200 [ ] (LOEHRER HARDY); | DE2312487 [ ] (OBRIST AG ALBERT) | Examination | US2942747 |