EP0019883 - Semiconductor device comprising a bonding pad [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.1987 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1980/25] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Komatsu, Shigeru 3-3-206, Iijima-danchi 527 Iijima-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi / JP | 02 /
Fujita, Katsuji 1607-6, Nakata-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi / JP | [1980/25] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/25] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 80102895.2 | 23.05.1980 | [1980/25] | Priority number, date | JP19790063219 | 24.05.1979 Original published format: JP 6321979 | [1980/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0019883 | Date: | 10.12.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0019883 | Date: | 13.07.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0019883 | Date: | 27.08.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.1983 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/48, H01L23/52 | [1980/25] | CPC: |
H01L24/05 (EP);
H01L2224/023 (EP);
H01L2224/04042 (EP);
H01L2224/05558 (EP);
H01L2224/05624 (EP);
H01L2224/45124 (EP);
H01L2224/45144 (EP);
H01L2224/48624 (EP);
H01L2224/48724 (EP);
H01L2924/01006 (EP);
H01L2924/01013 (EP);
H01L2924/01014 (EP);
H01L2924/01022 (EP);
H01L2924/01029 (EP);
H01L2924/01042 (EP);
H01L2924/01046 (EP);
H01L2924/01079 (EP);
H01L2924/01082 (EP);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/023, H01L2924/0001 (EP);
H01L2224/04042, H01L2924/00 (EP);
H01L2224/05624, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/05624, H01L2924/01014 (EP);
H01L2224/05624, H01L2924/01029 (EP);
H01L2224/45124, H01L2924/00 (EP);
H01L2224/45144, H01L2924/00 (EP);
H01L2224/48624, H01L2924/00 (EP); | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1980/25] | Title | German: | Halbleitervorrichtung mit Anschlusselektrode | [1980/25] | English: | Semiconductor device comprising a bonding pad | [1980/25] | French: | Dispositif à semiconducteur comprenant une électrode de raccordement | [1980/25] | Examination procedure | 23.05.1980 | Examination requested [1980/25] | 11.07.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.01.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.05.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2375718 (RADIOTECHNIQUE COMPELEC [FR]); | [X]FR2027664 (PHILIPS NV); | [A]FR2219527 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 21, no. 3, August 1978, pages 1052-1053, New York (USA); J. GNIEWEK et al.: "Dual insulators for planar multilevel interconnections". |