EP0019924 - Method and apparatus for recording data signals on a recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.1985 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DISCOVISION ASSOCIATES P.O. Box 6600 3300 Hyland Avenue Costa Mesa California 92626 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1980/25] | For all designated states DISCOVISION ASSOCIATES P.O. Box 6600 3300 Hyland Avenue Costa Mesa California 92626 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Szerlip, Stanley R. 7937 Woodman Avenue Panorama City California 91402 / US | [1980/25] | Representative(s) | Fleuchaus, Leo, et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Melchiorstrasse 42 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/25] | Fleuchaus, Leo, Dipl.-Ing., et al Melchiorstrasse 42 D-81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 80103017.2 | 30.05.1980 | [1980/25] | Priority number, date | US19790045112 | 04.06.1979 Original published format: US 45112 | [1980/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0019924 | Date: | 10.12.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0019924 | Date: | 16.01.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.1980 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/00, G11B27/36 | [1980/25] | CPC: |
G11B20/1883 (EP);
G11B19/04 (EP);
G11B20/1415 (EP);
G11B20/18 (EP);
G11B20/182 (EP);
G11B27/3027 (EP);
G11B27/36 (EP);
G11B7/0045 (EP);
G11B7/08 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1980/25] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Aufzeichnen von Datensignalen auf einem Speichermedium | [1980/25] | English: | Method and apparatus for recording data signals on a recording medium | [1980/25] | French: | Procédé et dispositif d'enregistrement de signaux de données sur un support d'enregistrement | [1980/25] | Examination procedure | 10.06.1981 | Examination requested [1981/37] | 24.03.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 10.08.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.11.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 29.06.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.10.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.05.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.04.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.05.1985 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | JP5448213 [ ]; | JPS4821379 [ ]; | US2937368 [ ] (NEWBY NEAL D); | US3365706 [ ] (KING GILBERT W); | DE2012402 [ ] (PRECISION INSTR CO); | US3657707 [ ] (MCFARLAND KEITH E, et al); | US3761905 [ ] (HOLLSTEIN C, et al); | US3790755 [ ] (SILVERMAN D); | US4145758 [ ] (DREXLER JEROME, et al); | DE2843584 [ ] (DREXLER TECH) | [ ] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, Band 13, Nr. 6, November 1970, New York, US, W. JANUS: "Skip of magnetic tape defective area", Seiten 1413-1414 * Das ganze Dokument * | [ ] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 3, Nr. 70 (E-117), Juni 1979, Seite 83 E 117 & JP - A - 54 48 213 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.)(16-04-1979) * Das ganze Dokument *, & JP5448213 A 00000000 | [ ] - IEEE SPECTRUM, Band 16, Nr. 2, Februar 1979, New York, US, G.C. KENNEY et al.: "An optical disk replaces 25 MAG tapes", Seiten 33-38 * Das ganze Dokument * |