Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
11.01.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.03.1985 [1985/11] |
29.05.1984 | Change - representative | published on 01.08.1984 [1984/31] |
17.12.1983 | (Expected) grant | published on 15.02.1984 [1984/07] |
05.02.1981 | Request for examination filed | published on 08.04.1981 [1981/14] |
08.11.1980 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 07.01.1981 [1981/01] |