Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE6312T | 15.03.1984 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE2923583 | 11.06.1979 | EP80103095 | 03.06.1980 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3066566D1 | 22.03.1984 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE3066566 | 03.06.1980 | DE2923583 | 11.06.1979 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0021152 | Global Dossier | 15.02.1984 | B1 | EP0021152 | 07.01.1981 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE2923583 | 11.06.1979 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE2923583 | 18.12.1980 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE2923583 | 11.06.1979 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0122904B | 28.04.1989 | B2 | JPS561353 | 09.01.1981 | A | Priority number | Date | DE2923583 | 11.06.1979 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0413359B | 09.03.1992 | B2 | JPH02199 | 05.01.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | DE2923583 | 11.06.1979 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0445520B | 27.07.1992 | B2 | JPH0256500 | 26.02.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | DE2923583 | 11.06.1979 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0415240B | 17.03.1992 | B2 | JPH0257194 | 26.02.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | DE2923583 | 11.06.1979 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4340581 | 20.07.1982 | A | Priority number | Date | DE2923583 | 11.06.1979 |