EP0021152 - Process for the immunological determination of basement membrane material, specific basement membrane fragments therefor and process for preparing or winning them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.1985 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.03.1985 [1985/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V. Bunsenstrasse 10 D-37073 Göttingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/01] | For all designated states Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V. Bunsenstrasse 10 D-37073 Göttingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Timpl, Rupert, Dr. Bergstrasse 18 D-8033 Krailing / DE | [1981/01] | Representative(s) | Weickmann, Heinrich, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/31] | Weickmann, Heinrich, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | ||
Former [1981/01] | Weickmann, Heinrich, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. H. Weickmann Dipl.-Phys.Dr. K. Fincke Dipl.-Ing. F.A. Weickmann Dipl.-Chem. B. Huber Dr.-Ing. H. Liska M hlstrasse 22 D-8000 München 86 / DE | Application number, filing date | 80103095.8 | 03.06.1980 | [1981/01] | Priority number, date | DE19792923583 | 11.06.1979 Original published format: DE 2923583 | [1981/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0021152 | Date: | 07.01.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0021152 | Date: | 15.02.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.1980 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/54, C07G7/00 | [1984/07] | CPC: |
G01N33/541 (EP,US);
G01N33/6887 (EP,US);
A61K39/00 (EP,US);
Y10S530/806 (EP);
Y10S530/811 (EP);
Y10S530/828 (EP);
Y10S530/851 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1981/01] | G01N33/54 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1981/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur immunologischen Bestimmung von Basalmembranmaterial, hierfür geeignete Basalmembranfragmente und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung, bzw. Gewinnung | [1981/01] | English: | Process for the immunological determination of basement membrane material, specific basement membrane fragments therefor and process for preparing or winning them | [1981/01] | French: | Procédé pour la détermination immunologique d'une matière de membrane basale, fragments de membranes basales spécifiques pour ce procédé et procédé pour leur préparation, resp. leur obtention | [1981/01] | Examination procedure | 23.01.1981 | Examination requested [1981/14] | 03.12.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 01.02.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 28.07.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.11.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |