EP0027494 - Interchangeable lens for photographic cameras, especially reflex cameras [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Prontor-Werk Alfred Gauthier GmbH Postfach 1122 Gauthierstrasse 56 D-7547 Wildbad-5 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/17] | For all designated states PRONTOR-WERK, Alfred Gauthier GmbH Postfach 1122 Gauthierstrasse 56 D-7547 Wildbad-5 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ludwig, Christian Dreissentalstrasse 54 D-7082 Oberkochen / DE | [1981/17] | Application number, filing date | 80103240.0 | 11.06.1980 | [1981/17] | Priority number, date | DE19792941601 | 13.10.1979 Original published format: DE 2941601 | [1981/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0027494 | Date: | 29.04.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0027494 | Date: | 02.06.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.1981 | Classification | IPC: | G03B9/66, G03B17/14, G03B19/12 | [1981/17] | CPC: |
G03B19/12 (EP,US);
G03B17/14 (EP,US);
G03B9/66 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1981/17] | Title | German: | Wechselobjektiv für photographische Kameras, insbesondere Spiegelreflexkameras | [1981/17] | English: | Interchangeable lens for photographic cameras, especially reflex cameras | [1981/17] | French: | Objectif interchangeable pour caméras photographiques, en particulier pour les caméras réflex | [1981/17] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 10.03.1981 | Examination requested [1981/21] | 29.09.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.11.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US2348510 [ ] (MCG AIKEN THOMAS); | FR1133228 [ ] (ZEISS IKON AG); | FR1316123 [ ] (COMPUR WERK GMBH & CO); | DE2017032 [ ] |