EP0021288 - Setting device for protective control system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.1984 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.11.1984 [1984/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1981/01] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamaura, Mitsuru 2-13-4, Mejirodai Hachioji-shi Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kondow, Ryotaro 1-11-4, Miyasaka Setagaya-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Inagaki, Junichi 2-13, Miya-machi Fuchu-shi Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Matsuzawa, Kunio 5-12-5, Hashimoto Sagamihara-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1981/01] | Representative(s) | Blumbach Weser Bergen Kramer Zwirner Hoffmann Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/01] | Blumbach Weser Bergen Kramer Zwirner Hoffmann Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 D-81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 80103321.8 | 13.06.1980 | [1981/01] | Priority number, date | JP19790075375 | 15.06.1979 Original published format: JP 7537579 | [1981/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0021288 | Date: | 07.01.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0021288 | Date: | 23.11.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.1980 | Classification | IPC: | H02H7/26, G06F13/00, G06F11/00 | [1981/01] | CPC: |
H02H3/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, LI, SE [1981/01] | Title | German: | Einstellvorrichtung für Schutzsteuersystem | [1981/01] | English: | Setting device for protective control system | [1981/01] | French: | Dispositif de réglage pour système de commande de protection | [1981/01] | Examination procedure | 13.06.1980 | Examination requested [1981/01] | 02.11.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.05.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 22.01.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.05.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.08.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | WO8000383 [ ] (SQUARE D CO [GB], et al); | FR2152564 [ ] (ALLEN BRADLEY CO, et al); | US3544777 [ ] (WINKLER TED) | [ ] - LANDIS & GYR MITTEILUNGEN, Nr. 11/12, 1971, Zug, CH E. LUTZ: "Einfuhrung in die Computer Technik", pages 1-33. * Page 2, "Vorwort", pages 3-6; pages 20-22 * | [ ] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON POWER APPARATUS & SYSTEMS, Vol. PAS-96, March/April 1977, New York, USA MIKI, SANO & MAKINO: "Study of high-speed distance relay using microcomputer", pages 602-610. * Page 605, right-hand column, line 33 - page 606, end of left-hand column * | [ ] - International publication WO 80/00383 (SQUARE D. CY.) * Page 2, line 20 - page 4, line 14; figure 1 * |