EP0023562 - Common wave radio network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Licentia Patent-Verwaltungs-GmbH Theodor-Stern-Kai 1 60596 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/06] | For all designated states Licentia Patent-Verwaltungs-GmbH Theodor-Stern-Kai 1 D-60596 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bürk, Hans, Ing. grad. Buchenweg 1 D-7915 Unterelchingen / DE | 02 /
Hipp, Hartmut, Dipl.-Ing. Römerhalde 2 D-7901 Staig / DE | 03 /
Plischke, Alfred, Ing. grad. Lindenweg 11 D-7915 Oberelchingen / DE | [1981/06] | Representative(s) | Schickle, Gerhard, et al Licentia Patent-Verwaltungs-GmbH Theodor-Stern-Kai 1 D-6000 Frankfurt/Main 70 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/06] | Schickle, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Licentia Patent-Verwaltungs-GmbH Theodor-Stern-Kai 1 D-6000 Frankfurt/Main 70 / DE | Application number, filing date | 80103467.9 | 21.06.1980 | [1981/06] | Priority number, date | DE19792931923 | 07.08.1979 Original published format: DE 2931923 | [1981/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0023562 | Date: | 11.02.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0023562 | Date: | 12.01.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.1980 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/26, H04B7/005 | [1981/06] | CPC: |
H04H20/67 (EP);
H04B7/2625 (EP);
H04W52/04 (EP);
H04W52/46 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, GB, LI, LU, NL [1981/06] | Title | German: | Gleichwellenfunknetz | [1981/06] | English: | Common wave radio network | [1981/06] | French: | Réseau radio à ondes communes | [1981/06] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 22.01.1981 | Examination requested [1981/14] | 24.08.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.07.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.10.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 30.06.1983 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3151295 (HAVILAND ROBERT P); | DE1466214 [ ] (PLESSEY CO LTD); | [A]DE2612476 (LICENTIA GMBH) | Examination | EP0020893 |