EP0022251 - Valve with a body connectible to tubes for conveying pressurized dense fluids, for instance concrete, for introducing a cleaning pig [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Friedrich Wilh. Schwing GmbH Postfach 247 Heerstrasse 9-27 D-44653 Herne / DE | [1981/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
v. Eckardstein, Karl-Ernst, Ing. grad. Auf dem Berge 30 D-4618 Kamen / DE | 02 /
Fiala, Werner, Dipl.-Ing. Dorstener Strasse 443 D-4690 Herne 2 / DE | 03 /
Schwing, Friedrich, Dipl.-Ing. Rathausstrasse 126 D-4690 Herne 2 / DE | [1981/02] | Representative(s) | Herrmann-Trentepohl, Werner Patentanwälte Herrmann-Trentepohl Grosse, Bockhorni & Partner Massenbergstrasse 19-21 44787 Bochum / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/02] | Herrmann-Trentepohl, Werner, Dipl.-Ing. Schaeferstrasse 18 D-44623 Herne / DE | Application number, filing date | 80103787.0 | 03.07.1980 | [1981/02] | Priority number, date | DE19792943967 | 31.10.1979 Original published format: DE 2943967 | DE19792927324 | 06.07.1979 Original published format: DE 2927324 | [1981/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0022251 | Date: | 14.01.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0022251 | Date: | 27.04.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.1980 | Classification | IPC: | B08B9/04, F17D3/08 | [1981/02] | CPC: |
B08B9/0552 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1981/02] | Title | German: | Rohrleitungsarmatur mit einem in Leitungen, die unter Druck stehende Dickstoffe, vorzugsweise Beton fördern, einbaubaren Gehäuse zum Einwechseln eines Wischers | [1981/02] | English: | Valve with a body connectible to tubes for conveying pressurized dense fluids, for instance concrete, for introducing a cleaning pig | [1981/02] | French: | Vanne pour conduite avec un corps incorporable pour l'échange du passe-diable nettoyeur, pouvant être raccordé à des tuyaux dans lesquels circulent des liquides épais sous pression, en particulier du béton | [1981/02] | Examination procedure | 08.01.1981 | Examination requested [1981/13] | 19.11.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.10.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.02.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.06.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE536529 [ ] (TORKRET GES M B H); | US2087679 [ ] (BALL CHARLES F, et al); | [A]US3000028 (BUIE JOHN C, et al); | US3063079 [ ] (BERGMAN STEPHEN A, et al); | US3146477 [ ] (BERGMAN STEPHEN A, et al); | [A]DE2624780 (DAICEL LTD) |