EP0022537 - Apparatus for the comminution of bulky objects [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Osnabrücker Metallwerke J. Kampschulte GmbH & Co. KG Ackerstrasse 56 D-4500 Osnabrück / DE | [1981/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rössler, Kurt Ringstrasse 28 D-4513 Belm / DE | [1981/03] | Representative(s) | Busse & Busse Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft Postfach 12 26 49002 Osnabrück / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Busse & Busse Patentanwälte Postfach 1226 49002 Osnabrück / DE | ||
Former [1981/03] | Busse & Busse Patentanwälte Postfach 1226 D-49002 Osnabrück / DE | Application number, filing date | 80103867.0 | 08.07.1980 | [1981/03] | Priority number, date | DE19792928471 | 14.07.1979 Original published format: DE 2928471 | [1981/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0022537 | Date: | 21.01.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0022537 | Date: | 22.09.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.1980 | Classification | IPC: | B02C18/40 | [1981/03] | CPC: |
B02C18/0084 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1981/03] | Title | German: | Maschine zum Zerkleinern von stückigen Gegenständen | [1981/03] | English: | Apparatus for the comminution of bulky objects | [1981/03] | French: | Machine pour le broyage d'objets encombrants | [1981/03] | Examination procedure | 23.01.1981 | Examination requested [1981/15] | 14.10.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.12.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 25.03.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.06.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | CH179943 [ ] (LENGWEILER EUGEN [CH]); | DE953671 [ ] (JOSEF FELDMEIER, et al); | DE2701897 [ ] (FROST MASCH & APP MAX) |