EP0027160 - Hip joint prosthesis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.1985 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gebrüder Sulzer Aktiengesellschaft Zürcherstrasse 9 CH-8401 Winterthur / CH | For all designated states Protek AG Stadtbachstrasse 64 3001 Bern / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1981/16] | For all designated states GEBRÜDER SULZER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Zürcherstrasse 9 CH-8401 Winterthur / CH | ||
For all designated states Protek AG Stadtbachstrasse 64 CH-3001 Bern / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Niederer, Peter Gino Reichenbachstrasse 6 CH-3052 Zollikofen / CH | [1981/16] | Representative(s) | Sparing Röhl Henseler Postfach 14 04 43 40074 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Sparing Röhl Henseler Patentanwälte European Patent Attorneys Postfach 14 04 43 40074 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1981/16] | Dipl.-Ing. H. Marsch Dipl.-Ing. K. Sparing Dipl.-Phys.Dr. W.H. Röhl Patentanwälte Rethelstrasse 123 D-4000 Düsseldorf 1 / DE | Application number, filing date | 80104099.9 | 15.07.1980 | [1981/16] | Priority number, date | CH19790009216 | 11.10.1979 Original published format: CH 921679 | [1981/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0027160 | Date: | 22.04.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0027160 | Date: | 28.10.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0027160 | Date: | 26.09.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.1981 | Classification | IPC: | A61F1/03 | [1981/16] | CPC: |
A61F2/36 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1981/16] | Title | German: | Hüftgelenkprothese | [1981/16] | English: | Hip joint prosthesis | [1981/16] | French: | Prothèse de l'articulation de la hanche | [1981/16] | Examination procedure | 15.07.1980 | Examination requested [1981/16] | 08.12.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.03.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.06.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.07.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2246940 (NAT RES DEV); | US3740769 [ ] (HABOUSH E); | [A]DE2324865 (FRIEDRICHSFELD GMBH); | [A]DE2537807 (CHARNLEY JOHN); | DE2547790 [ ] (SARATOWSKIJ NII TRAWMATOLOGII) | [D] - ORTHOPÄDE, Band 8, 1979, M.E. MÜLLER et al.: "Coxarthrose" Seiten 73,74 | Examination | - Prospekt 81 ter Fa. PROTEK Ltd., Switzerland |