EP0023986 - Cutting device for a stitcher in a printing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.1984 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.09.1984 [1984/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states M.A.N.-ROLAND Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Stadtbachstrasse 1 D-8900 Augsburg / DE | [1981/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Petersen, Godber Alter Postweg 115 D-8900 Augsburg / DE | [1981/07] | Application number, filing date | 80104179.9 | 17.07.1980 | [1981/07] | Priority number, date | DE19792932756 | 13.08.1979 Original published format: DE 2932756 | [1981/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0023986 | Date: | 18.02.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0023986 | Date: | 31.08.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.1980 | Classification | IPC: | B42B4/02, B41F13/66 | [1981/07] | CPC: |
B41F13/66 (EP);
B42B4/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, FR, GB, LI, SE [1981/07] | Title | German: | Schneidvorrichtung für eine Heftvorrichtung einer Druckmaschine | [1981/07] | English: | Cutting device for a stitcher in a printing machine | [1981/07] | French: | Dispositif de coupe pour une brocheuse de machine à imprimer | [1981/07] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 04.03.1981 | Examination requested [1981/20] | 23.02.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 16.03.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.11.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.06.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1436551 [ ]; | DE949475 [ ]; | [AD]DE1452995 | Examination | BE949475 |