EP0023050 - A double-twisting machine with pneumatic yarn-insertion means [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.12.1985 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.02.1986 [1986/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MURATA KIKAI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3 Minami, Ochiai-Cho, Kisshoin Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1981/04] | For all designated states MURATA KIKAI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3 Minami, Ochiai-Cho Kisshoin, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi 601 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yanobu, Hideo 8-4, Yamagoe Naka-machi Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi / JP | 02 /
Fujiwara, Kazuyuki No. 809, Kodan Nishito 14-18, Nagitsuji Ikejiri-Machi Yamashina-ku, Kyoto-shi / JP | [1981/41] |
Former [1981/39] | 01 /
Yanobu, Hideo 8-4, Yamagoe Naka-machi Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi / JP | ||
02 /
Fujiwara, Kazuyuki No. 809, Kodan Nishito 14-18, Nagitsuji Yamashina-ku Kyoto-shi / JP | |||
Former [1981/04] | 01 /
Yanobu, Hideo 8-4, Yamagoe Naka-machi Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi / JP | ||
02 /
Fujiwara, Kazuyuki 14-18, Nagitsuji Ikejiri-machi Yamashina-ku Kyoto-shi / JP | Representative(s) | Liedl, Gerhard, et al Patentanwalt Herterichstrasse 18 D-81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/04] | Liedl, Gerhard, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patentanwalt Herterichstrasse 18 D-81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 80104330.8 | 23.07.1980 | [1981/04] | Priority number, date | JP19790102232U | 23.07.1979 Original published format: JP 10223279 U | JP19790103255U | 25.07.1979 Original published format: JP 10325579 U | JP19790096431 | 27.07.1979 Original published format: JP 9643179 | [1981/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0023050 | Date: | 28.01.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0023050 | Date: | 06.02.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.1980 | Classification | IPC: | D01H13/10, D01H15/00 | [1981/04] | CPC: |
D01H13/106 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1981/04] | Title | German: | Doppeldraht-Zwirnmaschine mit pneumatischer Einfädelvorrichtung | [1981/04] | English: | A double-twisting machine with pneumatic yarn-insertion means | [1981/04] | French: | Métier à retordre à double torsion avec enfilage pneumatique du fil | [1981/04] | Examination procedure | 24.07.1981 | Examination requested [1981/40] | 23.09.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.07.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.11.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3731478 [ ] (FRANZEN G); | FR2325742 [ ] (HAMEL GMBH ZWIRNMASCHINEN [DE]); | FR2339688 [ ] (VERDOL SA [FR]) |