EP0025118 - Arrangement for the acoustic reproduction of signals, presented by means of a right and a left stereo-channel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 13.02.1984 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Riedlinger, Rainer, Dr.-Ing. Göhrenstrasse 16 D-7500 Karlsruhe 51 / DE | [1983/51] |
Former [1981/11] | For all designated states Braun Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 11 20 D-61466 Kronberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Riedlinger, Rainer, Dr. Ing. Göhrenstrasse 16 D-7500 Karlsruhe 51 / DE | 02 /
Koch, Walter, Dr. Ing. Frankfurter Strasse 26 D-6242 Kronberg / DE | 03 /
Schneider, Peter Am Hasensprung 23 D-6240 Königstein 3 / DE | 04 /
Hartwein, Peter Frankfurter Strasse 14a D-6240 Königstein / DE | [1981/11] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1983/51] |
Former [1981/11] | Einsele, Rolf, et al Braun Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 11 20 D-61466 Kronberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 80104595.6 | 04.08.1980 | [1981/11] | Priority number, date | DE19790023615U | 18.08.1979 Original published format: DE 7923615 U | DE19792933842 | 21.08.1979 Original published format: DE 2933842 | DE19792934000 | 22.08.1979 Original published format: DE 2934000 | [1981/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0025118 | Date: | 18.03.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.1980 | Classification | IPC: | H04R5/02, H04S1/00 | [1981/11] | CPC: |
H04R1/026 (EP);
H04R5/02 (EP);
H04R2201/021 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1981/11] | Title | German: | Anordnung zur akustischen Wiedergabe von Signalen, die mittels eines rechten und eines linken Stereo-Kanals darstellbar sind | [1981/11] | English: | Arrangement for the acoustic reproduction of signals, presented by means of a right and a left stereo-channel | [1981/11] | French: | Dispositif pour la reproduction acoustique de signaux qui sont représentables au moyen de canaux stéréophoniques de droite et de gauche | [1981/11] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 21.04.1981 | Examination requested [1981/27] | 06.04.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.09.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.11.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.03.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.1983 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1984/16] | 09.01.1984 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1984/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.08.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1983 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [D]US4105864 (BERKOVITZ ROBERT A); | [AD]DE2112516 (KURTZE GUENTHER DIPL PHYS PROF); | [AD]DE844169 (KLANGFILM GMBH); | [A]DE2637881 (SARMIENTO LUCIO JAIME) | [ ] - WIRELESS WORLD, Band 77, Nr. 1424, Februar 1971, Seiten 67-70, London, G.B., E.J. JORDAN: "Loudspeaker Stereo Techniques". | [P] - RADIO MENTOR ELECTRONIC, Band 45, Nr. 10, Oktober 1979, Seite 352, Berlin, DE, "Stereo im Ganzen: Holophonie mit neun Mittel-Hocht�nern". | [AD] - FUNKSCHAU, Heft 23, 1957, Seiten 633-636, M}nchen, DE, W. BURCK: "Uber elektrostatische Lautsprecher f}r grossere Frequenzbereiche". |