EP0045328 - A loading mechanism for a cassette tape recorder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.1984 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.11.1984 [1984/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Efuti Giken Co., LTD. 6-1-12, Rokkakubashi Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | For all designated states Funai Electric Co., Ltd. 7-627 Nakagaido Daito-shi Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1982/06] | For all designated states Efuti Giken Co., LTD. 6-1-12, Rokkakubashi Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | ||
For all designated states Funai Electric Co., Ltd. 7-627 Nakagaido Daito-shi Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawai, Tsutomu Yokosuka Heim Room No.711 28, Ogawa-cho Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1982/06] | Representative(s) | Lehn, Werner, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/47] | Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | ||
Former [1982/06] | Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing. Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patentanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 (Sternhaus) D-8000 München 81 / DE | Application number, filing date | 80104616.0 | 06.08.1980 | [1982/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0045328 | Date: | 10.02.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0045328 | Date: | 23.11.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.1981 | Classification | IPC: | G11B15/66 | [1982/06] | CPC: |
G11B15/6658 (EP);
G11B15/106 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/06] | Title | German: | Lademechanismus für einen Bandkassettenrekorder | [1982/06] | English: | A loading mechanism for a cassette tape recorder | [1982/06] | French: | Mécanisme de chargement pour un enregistreur de cassette à bande | [1982/06] | Examination procedure | 28.10.1981 | Examination requested [1982/06] | 16.08.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 26.04.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.08.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | Examination | US3831198 | US3864742 | GB1441292 | DE2406529 |