EP0025128 - Doffer mechanisms [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.1984 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.09.1984 [1984/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG Postfach 290 8406 Winterthur / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1981/11] | For all designated states MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG Postfach 290 CH-8406 Winterthur / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Feusi, Markus Strittackerstrasse 4 CH-8406 Winterthur / CH | 02 /
Flückiger, Peter Adlerstrasse 29 CH-8400 Winterthur / CH | 03 /
Gujer, Peter Kernstrasse 22 CH-8406 Winterthur / CH | 04 /
Schefer, Kurt Gutstrasse 7 CH-8400 Winterthur / CH | [1981/11] | Application number, filing date | 80104729.1 | 11.08.1980 | [1981/11] | Priority number, date | US19790068747 | 23.08.1979 Original published format: US 68747 | [1981/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0025128 | Date: | 18.03.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0025128 | Date: | 28.09.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.1981 | Classification | IPC: | B65H67/04 | [1981/11] | CPC: |
B65H67/0411 (EP,US);
B65H2555/11 (EP,US);
B65H2701/31 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1981/11] | Title | German: | Spulenabnahmemechanismen | [1981/11] | English: | Doffer mechanisms | [1981/11] | French: | Mécanismes de changement de bobines | [1981/11] | Examination procedure | 12.08.1981 | Examination requested [1981/42] | 14.05.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 08.03.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.06.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2455739 [ ] (BARMAG BARMER MASCHF); | [D]US4007884 (SCHIPPERS HEINZ, et al); | [D]EP0001359 (RIETER AG MASCHF [CH]) | Examination | US2911164 |