EP0024053 - Method of testing the rate of soiling of record carriers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1981/07] | Method of testing the rate of wear of record carriers | ||
[1983/49] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.10.1984 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GAO Gesellschaft für Automation und Organisation mbH Postfach 70 07 03 81307 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/07] | For all designated states GAO Gesellschaft für Automation und Organisation mbH Postfach 70 07 03 D-81307 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stenzel, Gerhard, Dr. Schiessstättstrasse 6 D-8000 München 2 / DE | 02 /
Kaule, Wittich, Dr. Germeringer Strasse 50 D-8035 Gauting / DE | [1981/07] | Representative(s) | Kador & Partner Part mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/07] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 D-80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 80104790.3 | 13.08.1980 | [1981/07] | Priority number, date | DE19792932962 | 14.08.1979 Original published format: DE 2932962 | [1981/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0024053 | Date: | 18.02.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0024053 | Date: | 07.12.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.1980 | Classification | IPC: | G07D7/00 | [1981/07] | CPC: |
G07D7/12 (EP,US);
G07D7/181 (EP,US);
G07D7/121 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1981/07] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Prüfung des Verschmutzungsgrades von Aufzeichnungsträgern | [1983/49] | English: | Method of testing the rate of soiling of record carriers | [1983/49] | French: | Procédé pour l'examen du degré d'encrassement de supports d'enregistrement | [1983/49] |
Former [1981/07] | Verfahren zur Prüfung des Abnutzungsgrades von Aufzeichnungsträgern | ||
Former [1981/07] | Method of testing the rate of wear of record carriers | ||
Former [1981/07] | Procédé pour l'examen du degré d'usure de supports d'enregistrement | Examination procedure | 05.02.1981 | Examination requested [1981/16] | 01.12.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 25.05.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.09.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2001/12] | LU | 31.08.1984 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3491243 (TSUGAMI TAISUKE); | US3759382 [ ] (WALKLEY J, et al); | [A]US3976198 (CARNES JR W ROBERT, et al); | GB1532019 [ ] (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO); | [A]US4147430 (GORGONE ROBERT L, et al) |