EP0024667 - Process for the manufacture of fluid dyestuff preparations, and their use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 21.06.1988 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/10] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koll, Jochen, Ing.grad. Am Telegraf 40 D-5068 Odenthal 3 / DE | 02 /
Mölls, Hans-Heinz, Dr. Max-Beckmann-Strasse 29 D-5090 Leverkusen / DE | 03 /
Hörnle, Reinhold, Dr. Hufelandstrasse 42 D-5000 Köln 80 / DE | 04 /
Schuffenhauer, Erhard, Ing.grad. Carl-Duisberg-Strasse 310 D-5090 Leverkusen / DE | 05 /
Brandt, Horst, Dr. Antoniusstrasse 4 D-5068 Odenthal / DE | 06 /
Bremer, Fritz, Dr. Paul-Klee-Strasse 64 D-5090 Leverkusen / DE | 07 /
Wolf, Karlheinz, Dr. Paul-Klee-Strasse 77 D-5090 Leverkusen / DE | 08 /
Schiwy, Willy Schubert Strasse 9 D-4019 Monheim / DE | [1981/10] | Application number, filing date | 80104892.7 | 16.08.1980 | [1981/10] | Priority number, date | DE19792934949 | 29.08.1979 Original published format: DE 2934949 | [1981/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0024667 | Date: | 11.03.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0024667 | Date: | 18.03.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0024667 | Date: | 04.05.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C09B67/40, C09B67/46 | [1981/10] | CPC: |
C09B67/0082 (EP,US);
C09B67/0091 (EP,US);
C09B67/0096 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1981/10] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung flüssiger Farbstoffzusammensetzungen und deren Verwendung | [1981/10] | English: | Process for the manufacture of fluid dyestuff preparations, and their use | [1981/10] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de préparations de colorants fluides et leur utilisation | [1981/10] | Examination procedure | 16.08.1980 | Examination requested [1981/10] | 24.02.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.04.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 29.10.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
03.02.1984
CIBA-GEIGY AG Patentabteilung Postfach CH-4002 Basel / CH Opponent's representative Zumstein sen., Fritz, et al, et al Dr. F. Zumstein sen. Dr. E. Assmann Dipl.-Ing. F. Klingseisen Dr. F. Zumstein jun. Bräuhausstrasse 4 D-80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/19] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
03.02.1984
CIBA-GEIGY AG Patentabteilung Postfach CH-4002 Basel / CH Opponent's representative Zumstein, Fritz sen., Dr., et al, et al Dr. F. Zumstein sen. Dr. E. Assmann Dipl.-Ing. F. Klingseisen Dr. F. Zumstein jun. Bräuhausstrasse 4 D-80331 München / DE | 05.03.1984 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 13.05.1984 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 23.05.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 03.08.1985 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 05.03.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 07.08.1986 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 21.08.1987 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 30.09.1987 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 09.03.1988 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 19.03.1988 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1988/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2015/21] |
Former [1989/27] | CH | 04.05.1983 | |
LI | 04.05.1983 | Documents cited: | Search | [D]DE2204725 (CIBA GEIGY AG); | [D]DE2358080 (ICI LTD); | [D]DE2643214 (BAYER AG); | [AP]GB2014597 (ICI LTD); | [AD]DE1469606 (BASF AG) |