EP0025523 - Piezoelectric transducers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1981/12] | Piezoelectric crystalline component for force transducers | ||
[1987/19] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 21.03.1987 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kistler Instrumente AG Eulachstrasse 22 8408 Winterthur / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1981/12] | For all designated states Kistler Instrumente AG Eulachstrasse 22 CH-8408 Winterthur / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Calderara, Reto Schaffhauserstrasse 51 CH-8400 Winterthur / CH | [1981/12] | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Horst, et al Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Schmidt, Horst, et al Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | ||
Former [1985/11] | Schmidt, Horst, Dr., et al H. Schmidt & B. Müller, Postfach 44 01 20 D-80750 München / DE | ||
Former [1981/12] | Pohlmann, Eckart, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwälte POHLMANN & SCHMIDT Siegfriedstrasse 8 D-8000 München 40 / DE | Application number, filing date | 80104950.3 | 20.08.1980 | [1981/12] | Priority number, date | CH19790008315 | 14.09.1979 Original published format: CH 831579 | [1981/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0025523 | Date: | 25.03.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0025523 | Date: | 27.05.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0025523 | Date: | 05.10.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/40] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0025523 | Date: | 06.05.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.1981 | Classification | IPC: | H01L41/04 | [1981/12] | CPC: |
H03H9/02015 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB [1981/12] | Title | German: | Piezoelektrische Messwandler | [1987/19] | English: | Piezoelectric transducers | [1987/19] | French: | Transducteur piézoélectrique | [1987/19] |
Former [1981/12] | Piezoelektrisches Kristallelement für Messwandler | ||
Former [1981/12] | Piezoelectric crystalline component for force transducers | ||
Former [1981/12] | Composant cristallin piézoélectrique pour transducteurs de mesure | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 19.11.1981 | Examination requested [1982/04] | 09.12.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 17.03.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
18.06.1984
27.07.1984
ADMISSIBLE AVL Gesellschaft für Verbrennungskraftmaschinen und Messtechnik mbH Prof.Dr.Dr.h.c. Hans List Kleiststrasse 48 A-8020 Graz / AT Opponent's representative Krause, Walter Patentanwälte Babeluk - Krause, Mariahilfer Gürtel 39/17 1150 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1984/34] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.06.1984
27.07.1984
ADMISSIBLE AVL Gesellschaft für Verbrennungskraftmaschinen und Messtechnik mbH Prof.Dr.Dr.h.c. Hans List Kleiststrasse 48 A-8020 Graz / AT Opponent's representative Krause, Walter, Dr. Dipl.-Ing. Postfach 200 Singerstrasse 8 A-1010 Wien / AT | 14.08.1984 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 21.02.1985 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 11.03.1985 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.1985 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 11.04.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 12.06.1986 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 05.11.1986 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 30.01.1987 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3437851 [ ] (CADY WALTER G) |