EP0025552 - Process for the preparation of 1-haloalkyl isocyanates and 1-alkenyl isocyanates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.1984 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.09.1984 [1984/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/12] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koenig, Karl-Heinz, Dr. Pierstrasse 8A D-6710 Frankenthal / DE | 02 /
Feuerherd, Karl-Heinz, Dr. Berner Weg 34 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
Oeser, Heinz-Guenter, Dr. Friedrich-Burschell-Weg 19 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | [1981/12] | Application number, filing date | 80105234.1 | 03.09.1980 | [1981/12] | Priority number, date | DE19792937006 | 13.09.1979 Original published format: DE 2937006 | [1981/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0025552 | Date: | 25.03.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0025552 | Date: | 21.09.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C07C118/04, C07C119/042, C07C23/28, C07C17/08 | [1981/12] | CPC: |
C07C263/04 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C263/04, C07C265/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1981/24] |
Former [1981/12] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von 1-Halogenalkylisocyanaten und 1-Alkenylisocyanaten | [1981/12] | English: | Process for the preparation of 1-haloalkyl isocyanates and 1-alkenyl isocyanates | [1981/12] | French: | Procédé de préparation de 1-halogénoalcoylisocyanates et de 1-alcénylisocyanates | [1981/12] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 07.01.1981 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, IT, LU, SE | 18.03.1981 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 28.08.1981 | Examination requested [1981/45] | 25.02.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.11.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 01.03.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.06.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.10.1980 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 03.10.1980 | IT   M02   Not yet paid | 03.10.1980 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 03.10.1980 | SE   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1807494 (HOECHST AG); | [A]DE1930329 (HOECHST AG); | [A]DE2210285 (BASF AG); | [A]US3816495 (MIDDLETON W) |