EP0026345 - Conveying device for bulk materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.1984 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.05.1984 [1984/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eikelmann, Reinhard Buchengrund 10 D-4955 Hille 1 / DE | [1981/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1981/14] | Application number, filing date | 80105236.6 | 03.09.1980 | [1981/14] | Priority number, date | DE19792936594 | 11.09.1979 Original published format: DE 2936594 | [1981/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0026345 | Date: | 08.04.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0026345 | Date: | 18.05.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.1981 | Classification | IPC: | B65G11/18, E04G3/06 | [1981/14] | CPC: |
B65G11/186 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1981/14] | Title | German: | Schüttgutfördervorrichtung | [1981/14] | English: | Conveying device for bulk materials | [1981/14] | French: | Dispositif pour transporter des matières en vrac | [1981/14] | Examination procedure | 06.10.1981 | Examination requested [1981/50] | 13.04.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.09.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.11.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.02.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US1712974 [ ] (VENARD WILLIAM G); | GB689964 [ ] (FREDERICK GARDINER ROWAN HENDE); | CH291759 [ ] (DUESA AG [CH]); | DE924480 [ ] (URBAN ERHARD, et al); | US3135351 [ ] (CHARLES ECONOMOS, et al); | US3926290 [ ] (ISOJIMA IMAO, et al); | US3949850 [ ] (SCHUMM H DALE); | DE2633016 [ ] (BAUMANN WOLFGANG) |