EP0028301 - Exposure control circuit for the light source of a camera [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1981/19] | Light source for a camera | ||
[1983/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.1984 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Optical Co., Ltd. 43-2, 2-chome, Hatagaya Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1981/19] | For all designated states OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO., LTD. 43-2, 2-chome, Hatagaya Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hosoda, Seiichi 4-32-8, Hon-machi Fuchu-shi Tokyo / JP | [1981/19] | Representative(s) | Lins, Edgar, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/19] | Lins, Edgar, Dipl.-Phys. Dr.jur., et al Patentanwälte Gramm + Lins Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1 D-38122 Braunschweig / DE | Application number, filing date | 80105268.9 | 04.09.1980 | [1981/19] | Priority number, date | JP19790117867 | 17.09.1979 Original published format: JP 11786779 | [1981/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0028301 | Date: | 13.05.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0028301 | Date: | 01.07.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0028301 | Date: | 09.11.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.1981 | Classification | IPC: | G03B7/083, A61B1/04 | [1981/19] | CPC: |
G03B7/083 (EP,US);
G03B15/03 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1981/19] | Title | German: | Belichtungssteuerschaltung für die Lichtquelle einer Kamera | [1983/45] | English: | Exposure control circuit for the light source of a camera | [1983/45] | French: | Circuit de contrôle d'exposition pour la source de lumière d'un appareil photographique | [1983/45] |
Former [1981/19] | Lichtquelle für Kamera | ||
Former [1981/19] | Light source for a camera | ||
Former [1981/19] | Source de lumière pour appareil photographique | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 22.08.1981 | Examination requested [1981/44] | 11.03.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 29.04.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.08.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.07.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 09.11.1983 | CH | 09.11.1983 | IT | 09.11.1983 | LI | 09.11.1983 | NL | 09.11.1983 | SE | 09.11.1983 | [1999/42] |
Former [1985/23] | BE | 09.11.1983 | |
CH | 09.11.1983 | ||
LI | 09.11.1983 | ||
NL | 09.11.1983 | ||
SE | 09.11.1983 | ||
Former [1984/31] | BE | 09.11.1983 | |
CH | 09.11.1983 | ||
LI | 09.11.1983 | ||
SE | 09.11.1983 | ||
Former [1984/22] | BE | 09.11.1983 | |
CH | 09.11.1983 | ||
LI | 09.11.1983 | ||
Former [1984/13] | CH | 09.11.1983 | |
LI | 09.11.1983 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1279456 (PRONTOR WERK GAUTHIER GMBH); | GB1148059 [ ] (HONEYWELL INC [US]); | US3670722 [ ] (KOSAKA SHINYA); | US3677151 [ ] (WERNER NICKEL, et al); | US4086583 [ ] (TAKAHASHI NAGASHIGE); | US4104654 [ ] (MAITANI YOSHIHISA, et al) | [ ] - BURR-BROWN 1979, General Catalog, July 1978, Arizona, USA "General purpose comparator", pages 4-9 to 4-10. | [ ] - BURR-BROWN 1979, General Catalog, July 1978, Arizona, USA "Hybrid microcircuit peak detector", pages 4-11 to 4-15. | Examination | - BURR-BROWN 1979, General Catalog, July 1978 Arizona, USA "Hybrid microcircuit peak detector", pages 4-11 to 4-15 |