EP0025221 - Flat display device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.05.1984 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.07.1984 [1984/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1981/11] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Noguchi, Mikio 4-25, Hamasuka Chigasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Kobayashi, Kazuho 2507-732, 5-1, 2-chome Shiomidai, Isogo-ku Yokohama-shi / JP | 03 /
Takenaka, Shigeo 61 Tokiwa-cho Fukaya-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 04 /
Shimbo, Masaru 4312-10, Izumi-cho Totsuka-ku, Yokohama-shi / JP | [1981/11] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/11] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 80105309.1 | 04.09.1980 | [1981/11] | Priority number, date | JP19790112830 | 05.09.1979 Original published format: JP 11283079 | JP19790112831 | 05.09.1979 Original published format: JP 11283179 | [1981/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0025221 | Date: | 18.03.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0025221 | Date: | 29.06.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.1980 | Classification | IPC: | H01J31/12, H01J29/04, H01J29/52, H01J63/06 | [1981/11] | CPC: |
H01J29/467 (EP,US);
H01J29/04 (EP,US);
H01J31/127 (EP,US);
H01J2329/8625 (EP,US);
H01J2329/863 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1981/11] | Title | German: | Flache Anzeigevorrichtung | [1981/11] | English: | Flat display device | [1981/11] | French: | Dispositif de visualisation plat | [1981/11] | Examination procedure | 04.09.1980 | Examination requested [1981/11] | 25.10.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.12.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.03.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4020381 [ ] (OESS FREDERICK G, et al); | [A]FR2300412 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]); | [A]DE2742555 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]US3622828 (ZINN MORTIMER H) | Examination | EP0024656 |