EP0026362 - Asbestos diaphragms for electrochemical cells and their manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.08.1984 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.10.1984 [1984/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/14] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Höhne, Karl, Dr. Reinigerstrasse 15 D-8520 Erlangen / DE | [1981/14] | Application number, filing date | 80105364.6 | 08.09.1980 | [1981/14] | Priority number, date | DE19792938069 | 20.09.1979 Original published format: DE 2938069 | [1981/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0026362 | Date: | 08.04.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0026362 | Date: | 13.05.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0026362 | Date: | 19.10.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.1981 | Classification | IPC: | B01D13/04, H01M2/16, // C25B13/06 | [1981/14] | CPC: |
C25B13/04 (EP,US);
H01M50/44 (EP,US);
H01M2300/0014 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y10T428/31652 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1981/14] | Title | German: | Asbestdiaphragmen für elektrochemische Zellen und deren Herstellung | [1981/14] | English: | Asbestos diaphragms for electrochemical cells and their manufacture | [1981/14] | French: | Diaphragmes d'amiante pour cellules électrochimiques et leur fabrication | [1981/14] | Examination procedure | 15.10.1981 | Examination requested [1981/52] | 19.05.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.03.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.07.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DD109322 [ ] | Examination | DE1596241 | DE1294941 | DE2127654 | DE2426037 | DE2609175 | DE1918595 | DE2713101 | US4065534 |