EP0029100 - Coating composition comprising compounds that contain silyl groups and a hydrolysable ester [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 29.11.1991 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KANEGAFUCHI KAGAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-4 Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 530 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1981/21] | For all designated states KANEGAFUCHI KAGAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-4 Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kato, Yasushi 1-11-3, Katayama-cho Nagata-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Furukawa, Hisao Sanseiso, 96-1 Aza-Takigahira Shioya-cho Tarumi-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | 03 /
Nakatsuka, Saori 11-20, Hama-cho Ashiya-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [1981/21] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/37] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | ||
Former [1981/21] | Vossius-Vossius-Tauchner-Heunemann-Rauh Patentanwälte P.O.Box 860767 Siebertstrasse 4 D-8000 München 86 / DE | Application number, filing date | 80105650.8 | 19.09.1980 | [1981/21] | Priority number, date | JP19790121181 | 19.09.1979 Original published format: JP 12118179 | [1981/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0029100 | Date: | 27.05.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0029100 | Date: | 16.05.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/20] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0029100 | Date: | 15.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C09D183/04, // C09J183/04 ,(C09D183/04, C08L101:02, C08K5:10, 5:54) | [1992/03] | CPC: |
C09D201/02 (EP);
C08G63/695 (EP);
C08K5/04 (EP);
C08K5/54 (EP);
C09D167/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/04, C08L67/00 (EP);
C08K5/54, C08L67/00 (EP);
C09D167/00, C08L2666/28 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1981/21] | C09D3/82, // C08J3/24 ,(C09D3/82, C08L101:02, C08K5:10, 5:54) | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [1981/21] | Title | German: | Überzugszusammensetzung mit Silyl-Gruppen enthaltenden Verbindungen und einem hydrolysierbaren Ester | [1981/21] | English: | Coating composition comprising compounds that contain silyl groups and a hydrolysable ester | [1981/21] | French: | Composition de revêtement contenant un composé à groupes silyle et un ester hydrolysable | [1981/21] | Examination procedure | 26.10.1981 | Examination requested [1982/01] | 17.05.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.10.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
15.02.1985
12.04.1985
ADMISSIBLE Hüls Troisdorf Aktiengesellschaft Abt.: Patente/Lizenzen D-53839 Troisdorf / DE | 02
14.02.1985
12.04.1985
ADMISSIBLE Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL Opponent's representative Schenkman, Herbert Jan c/o R. Sieders c.s., P.O. Box 314 6800 AH Arnhem / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1985/18] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.02.1985
12.04.1985
ADMISSIBLE Hüls Troisdorf Aktiengesellschaft Abt.: Patente/Lizenzen D-53839 Troisdorf / DE | ||
02
14.02.1985
12.04.1985
ADMISSIBLE Akzo N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL Opponent's representative Schenkman, Herbert Jan c/o R. Sieders c.s., P.O. Box 314 NL-6800 AH Arnhem / NL | |||
Former [1985/17] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.02.1985
12.04.1985
ADMISSIBLE Hüls Troisdorf Aktiengesellschaft Abt.: Patente/Lizenzen D-53839 Troisdorf / DE | 12.11.1985 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.1986 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 09.09.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 18.11.1986 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 15.05.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 27.07.1987 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 01.12.1987 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 08.10.1990 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 21.01.1991 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 25.04.1991 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 25.01.1988 | Appeal received No. T0067/88 | 08.04.1988 | Statement of grounds filed | 08.10.1990 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2507362 [ ]; | GB1461531 [ ]; | GB1250414 [ ]; | US4157321 [ ]; | US3903052 [ ] |