EP0027901 - Improved ribbon lift and feed mechanism for a typewriter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1981/18] | Improved ribbon feed and lift mechanism for a typewriter | ||
[1985/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.1986 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/18] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kacmarcik, Donald J. 423 Whispering Hills Drive Lexington, KY 50403 / US | 02 /
Okcuoglu, Selahattin A. 2001 Blairmore Road Lexington, KY 40502 / US | 03 /
Raider, Jerry W. 445 Lakeshore Drive Lexington, KY 40502 / US | [1981/18] | Representative(s) | Tubiana, Max Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Industrielle 06610 La Gaude / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1981/18] | Tubiana, Max Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Industrielle F-06610 La Gaude / FR | Application number, filing date | 80105776.1 | 25.09.1980 | [1981/18] | Priority number, date | US19790089661 | 30.10.1979 Original published format: US 89661 | US19790089662 | 30.10.1979 Original published format: US 89662 | [1981/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0027901 | Date: | 06.05.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0027901 | Date: | 10.11.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0027901 | Date: | 26.06.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B41J35/22, B41J33/16, B41J33/38 | [1981/18] | CPC: |
B41J33/16 (EP);
B41J33/34 (EP);
B41J33/38 (EP);
B41J33/54 (EP);
B41J35/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1981/18] | Title | German: | Farbbandhub- und -vorschubmechanismus für eine Schreibmaschine | [1985/26] | English: | Improved ribbon lift and feed mechanism for a typewriter | [1985/26] | French: | Mécanisme vibrateur et mécanisme d'avance pour ruban de machine à écrire | [1985/26] |
Former [1981/18] | Farbbandvorschub- und -hubmechanismus für eine Schreibmaschine | ||
Former [1981/18] | Improved ribbon feed and lift mechanism for a typewriter | ||
Former [1981/18] | Mécanisme d'avance et mécanisme vibrateur pour ruban de machine à écrire | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 28.08.1981 | Examination requested [1981/45] | 18.11.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.06.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 06.12.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.03.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 26.06.1985 | NL | 26.06.1985 | [1999/42] |
Former [1986/31] | NL | 26.06.1985 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2349769 ; | [AD]FR2391853 |