EP0026488 - Method for oil lubrication and device for carrying out the method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.1984 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.01.1985 [1985/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states b a r m a g Barmer Maschinenfabrik Aktiengesellschaft Leverkuser Strasse 65 Postfach 110 240 D-5630 Remscheid 11 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/14] | For all designated states b a r m a g Barmer Maschinenfabrik Aktiengesellschaft Leverkuser Strasse 65 Postfach 110 240 D-5630 Remscheid 11 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bremer, Hermann Erdelenstrasse 9 D-5630 Remscheid / DE | [1981/14] | Application number, filing date | 80105845.4 | 26.09.1980 | [1981/14] | Priority number, date | DE19792939604 | 29.09.1979 Original published format: DE 2939604 | [1981/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0026488 | Date: | 08.04.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0026488 | Date: | 29.04.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0026488 | Date: | 18.01.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.1981 | Classification | IPC: | F16N7/32, F16N7/00 | [1981/14] | CPC: |
F16C33/6685 (EP,US);
D03J1/003 (EP);
F16C19/06 (EP);
F16C33/6659 (EP,US);
F16N7/00 (EP,US);
F16N7/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1981/14] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Ölschmierung und Vorrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens | [1981/14] | English: | Method for oil lubrication and device for carrying out the method | [1981/14] | French: | Procédé pour la lubrification à l'huile et dispositif pour la mise en oeuvre de ce procédé | [1981/14] | Examination procedure | 09.05.1981 | Examination requested [1981/29] | 15.03.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 24.06.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.12.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.06.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.10.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB1204607 [ ] (ATO RES CORP [US]); | US2457813 [ ] (AVERY FLAGGE HOWARD); | DE2158998 [ ] (TECALEMIT GMBH DEUTSCHE); | GB1141371 [ ] (CYRIL DOUGLAS LISTER); | DE2415016 [ ] (TELDIX GMBH); | FR2324937 [ ] (SKF IND TRADING & DEV [NL]) |