EP0027908 - 2-Hydroxyalkyl-3,4,5,trihydroxy piperidines, processes for their preparation and their use as medicaments [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.1984 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.09.1984 [1984/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/18] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kinast, Günther, Dr. Am Eckbusch 35/33 D-5600 Wuppertal-1 / DE | 02 /
Müller, Lutz, Dr. Kronprinzenallee 111 D-5600 Wuppertal-1 / DE | 03 /
Sitt, Rüdiger, Dr. Claudiusweg 9 D-5600 Wuppertal-1 / DE | 04 /
Puls, Walter, Dr. In den Birken 75 D-5600 Wuppertal-1 / DE | [1981/18] | Application number, filing date | 80105893.4 | 29.09.1980 | [1981/18] | Priority number, date | DE19792942365 | 19.10.1979 Original published format: DE 2942365 | [1981/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0027908 | Date: | 06.05.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0027908 | Date: | 05.08.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0027908 | Date: | 14.09.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C07D211/46, C07D211/54, C07H9/04, C07H15/12, A61K31/445, // C07D498/04 | [1983/37] | CPC: |
C07H9/04 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/08 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1981/18] | C07D211/46, C07D211/54, C07H9/04, C07H15/12, C07D498/04, A61K31/445, // (C07D498/04, 263:00, 221:00) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1983/36] |
Former [1981/18] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | 2-Hydroxyalkyl-3,4,5-trihydroxypiperidine, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung als Arzneimittel | [1983/37] | English: | 2-Hydroxyalkyl-3,4,5,trihydroxy piperidines, processes for their preparation and their use as medicaments | [1981/18] | French: | 2-Hydroxyalkyl-3,4,5-trihydroxy-pipéridines, procédés pour leur préparation et leur utilisation comme médicaments | [1981/18] |
Former [1981/18] | 2-Hydroxyalkyl-3,4,5-trihydroxy-piperidine, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung als Arzneimittel | Examination procedure | 29.09.1980 | Examination requested [1981/18] | 30.11.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.02.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.06.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1768044 [ ]; | [D]EP0000947 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [AP]DE2915037 (NIPPON SHINYAKU CO LTD); | [P]DE2824781 |