Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
01.12.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.01.1987 [1987/04] |
30.11.1985 | (Expected) grant | published on 29.01.1986 [1986/05] |
25.07.1985 | Change - applicant | published on 25.09.1985 [1985/39] |
25.07.1985 | Change - representative | published on 25.09.1985 [1985/39] |
13.02.1982 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 14.04.1982 [1982/15] |
13.02.1982 | Request for examination filed | published on 14.04.1982 [1982/15] |