Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0049303 | Global Dossier | 29.01.1986 | B1 | EP0049303 | 14.04.1982 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP80106088 | 07.10.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE17786T | 15.02.1986 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP80106088 | 07.10.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3071395D1 | 13.03.1986 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP80106088 | 07.10.1980 |