EP0024747 - Anilinomethyloxime ethers and processes for their production [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.1984 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.05.1984 [1984/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/10] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stetter, Jörg, Dr. Pahlkestrasse 3 D-5600 Wuppertal 1 / DE | 02 /
Draber, Wilfried, Dr. In den Birken 81 D-5600 Wuppertal 1 / DE | 03 /
Regel, Erik, Ing.grad. Bergerheide 72a D-5600 Wuppertal 1 / DE | 04 /
Eue, Ludwig, Dr. Paul-Klee-Strasse 36 D-5090 Leverkusen / DE | 05 /
Schmidt, Robert Rudolf, Dr. Hahnenweg 5 D-5000 Köln 80 / DE | [1981/10] | Application number, filing date | 80106219.1 | 22.10.1979 | [1981/10] | Priority number, date | DE19782847827 | 03.11.1978 Original published format: DE 2847827 | DE19792931103 | 31.07.1979 Original published format: DE 2931103 | [1981/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0024747 | Date: | 11.03.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0024747 | Date: | 11.05.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.1980 | Classification | IPC: | C07C131/00, // A01N37/22 | [1981/10] | CPC: |
A01N43/72 (EP);
A01N37/22 (EP);
A01N37/24 (EP);
A01N37/36 (EP);
A01N43/80 (EP);
C07C233/88 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1981/49] |
Former [1981/10] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE | Title | German: | Anilinomethyloxim-ether und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1981/10] | English: | Anilinomethyloxime ethers and processes for their production | [1981/10] | French: | Ethers d'anilinométhyloxime et procédés pour leur préparation | [1981/10] | Examination procedure | 13.10.1980 | Examination requested [1981/10] | 02.11.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.11.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.11.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP79104081.9 / EP0010715 | Opposition(s) | 14.02.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.11.1981 | 03   M06   Not yet paid | 01.11.1982 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   22.12.1982 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2702119 [ ] (LAFON LABOR); | GB1488462 [ ] (DELALANDE SA) |