EP0036441 - Process for preparing carboxylic acid cyanides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.1984 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Degussa GmbH Weissfrauenstrasse 9 60311 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/39] | For all designated states Degussa Aktiengesellschaft Weissfrauenstrasse 9 D-60311 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kleemann, Axel, Dr. Greifenhagenstrasse 9 D-6450 Hanau 9 / DE | 02 /
Lehmann, Bernd, Dr. Flurstrasse 5 D-6450 Freigericht / DE | 03 /
Klenk, Herbert, Dr. Grünaustrasse 19 D-6450 Hanau 9 / DE | [1981/39] | Application number, filing date | 80106231.6 | 14.10.1980 | [1981/39] | Priority number, date | DE19803011305 | 24.03.1980 Original published format: DE 3011305 | [1981/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0036441 | Date: | 30.09.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0036441 | Date: | 07.09.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C07C120/00, C07C121/76 | [1981/39] | CPC: |
C07C253/14 (EP,US);
C07C2601/02 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C253/14, C07C255/17 (EP,US);
C07C253/14, C07C255/31 (US,EP);
C07C253/14, C07C255/40 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1981/39] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Carbonsäurecyaniden | [1981/39] | English: | Process for preparing carboxylic acid cyanides | [1981/39] | French: | Procédé de préparation de cyanures d'acides carboxyliques | [1981/39] | Examination procedure | 29.10.1981 | Examination requested [1982/01] | 20.04.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 17.02.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.06.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.10.1983 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | DE2624891 [ ] (DEGUSSA); | DE2708182 [ ] (DEGUSSA) |