EP0028781 - Polyisocyanate mixtures of the diphenylmethane series and their use as additives in adhesives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/20] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meyer, Rolf-Volker, Dr. Büchheimerstrasse 23 D-4150 Krefeld / DE | 02 /
Hombach, Rudolf, Dr. Johann-Janssen-Strasse 24 D-5090 Leverkusen 1 / DE | 03 /
Dollhausen, Manfred, Dr. Herzogenfeld 21 D-5068 Odenthal / DE | [1981/20] | Application number, filing date | 80106709.1 | 31.10.1980 | [1981/20] | Priority number, date | DE19792945656 | 12.11.1979 Original published format: DE 2945656 | [1981/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0028781 | Date: | 20.05.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0028781 | Date: | 04.08.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C07C119/048, C08G18/76, C09J3/12, C09J3/16 | [1981/20] | CPC: |
C09J107/00 (EP);
C07C265/12 (EP);
C08G18/10 (EP);
C08G18/69 (EP);
C08G18/7664 (EP);
C09J121/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C08G18/10, C08G18/70 (EP);
C08G18/10, C08G18/7664 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1981/20] | Title | German: | Polyisocyanatgemische der Diphenylmethanreihe und ihre Verwendung als Zusatzmittel in Klebstoffen | [1981/20] | English: | Polyisocyanate mixtures of the diphenylmethane series and their use as additives in adhesives | [1981/20] | French: | Mélanges de polyisocyanates de la série du diphénylméthane et leur utilisation comme additifs dans des adhésifs | [1981/20] | Examination procedure | 31.10.1980 | Examination requested [1981/20] | 18.08.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 08.02.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.05.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US2683730 [ ] (SEEGER NELSON V, et al); | GB1094321 [ ] (DU PONT); | FR1553295 [ ]; | DE1594118 [ ] (HENKEL & CIE GMBH) |