blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0030276

EP0030276 - Circuit arrangement for charging a battery [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  27.07.1989
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2015Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI
published on 20.05.2015  [2015/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Braun Aktiengesellschaft
Postfach 11 20
D-61466 Kronberg / DE
[1981/24]
Inventor(s)01 / Becker, Klaus
Hellmersgarten 7
D-6239 Eppstein / DE
02 / Lang, Gerhard
Am Stadttor 2
D-6395 Weilrod 7 / DE
03 / Pittrof, Kurt
Binärstrasse 17
D-6238 Hofheim / DE
04 / Schwarz, Gerhard
Eggestrasse 16
D-5990 Altena / DE
[1981/24]
Representative(s)Einsele, Rolf
Braun Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 1120
61466 Kronberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [1981/24]Einsele, Rolf
Braun Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 11 20
D-61466 Kronberg / DE
Application number, filing date80106836.206.11.1980
[1981/24]
Priority number, dateDE1979294942108.12.1979         Original published format: DE 2949421
[1981/24]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0030276
Date:17.06.1981
Language:DE
[1981/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0030276
Date:20.02.1985
Language:DE
[1985/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.04.1981
ClassificationIPC:H02J7/04, H02J7/10, H02M3/335
[1981/24]
CPC:
H02J7/02 (EP); H02M3/33507 (EP); H02J2207/20 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [1981/24]
TitleGerman:Schaltungsanordnung zum Laden einer Batterie[1981/24]
English:Circuit arrangement for charging a battery[1981/24]
French:Agencement de circuit pour la charge d'une batterie[1981/24]
Examination procedure07.07.1981Examination requested  [1981/38]
18.08.1982Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.12.1982Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.11.1983Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.03.1984Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.05.1984Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
30.07.1984Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.09.1984Fee for grant paid
28.09.1984Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  20.11.1985  14.01.1986  ADMISSIBLE
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Opponent's representative
Peters, Rudolf Johannes
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
 02  19.11.1985  18.12.1985  ADMISSIBLE
Schrack Elektronik-Aktiengesellschaft
Pottendorferstrasse 25-27
A-1120 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
Gibler, Ferdinand
Gibler & Poth Patentanwälte OG
Dorotheergasse 7/14
1010 Wien / AT
 [N/P]
Former [1986/05]
Opponent(s)01  20.11.1985  14.01.1986  ADMISSIBLE
Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Opponent's representative
Peters, Rudolf Johannes
INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
 02  19.11.1985  18.12.1985  ADMISSIBLE
Schrack Elektronik-Aktiengesellschaft
Pottendorferstrasse 25-27
A-1120 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
Gibler, Ferdinand, Dipl.Ing. Dr. techn.
Dorotheergasse 7/14
A-1010 Wien / AT
Former [1986/04]
Opponent(s)01  20.11.1985  14.01.1986  ADMISSIBLE
Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Opponent's representative
Peters, Rudolf Johannes
INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
17.01.1986Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
26.05.1986Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
08.07.1986Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02)
06.09.1986Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
02.12.1986Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
01.04.1987Reply to a communication from the opposition division
27.10.1987Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
07.01.1988Reply to a communication from the opposition division
19.04.1989Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
02.05.1989Legal effect of revocation of patent [1989/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.10.1982Renewal fee patent year 03
28.10.1983Renewal fee patent year 04
02.11.1984Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2015/21]
Former [1990/16]CH20.02.1985
LI20.02.1985
Documents cited:SearchDE2457664  [ ] (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT)
    [ ] - ELECTRICAL DESIGN NEWS, Band 15, Nr. 2, 15. Januar 1970, Denver, US, D.A. ZINDER: "Fast-charging systems for Ni-CD batteries", Seiten 65-67 * Das ganze Dokument *
    [ ] - ELECTRONICS, Band 51, Nr. 26, 21. Dezember 1978, New York, US, R.J. BOSCHERT: "Flyback converters solid-state solution to low-cost switching power supplies", Seiten 100-104 * Seite 102, linke Spalte, Zeile 11 bis Seite 104, linke Spalte, Zeile 23; Figuren 3-5 *
ExaminationUS3435320
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.