EP0028840 - Arrangement for introducing heat into the primary circuit of the heat pump of a reverse-cycle heating installation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.1982 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Krüger, Bernhard Albert-Moser-Strasse 63 D-7053 Kernen i.R. / DE | [1981/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hesslinger, Siegmar Hohenstaufenstrasse 42 D-7141 Möglingen / DE | [1981/20] | Representative(s) | Lutz, Johannes Dieter Patentanwälte Wolf & Lutz Hauptmannsreute 93 70193 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/20] | Lutz, Johannes Dieter, Dr. Patentanwälte Wolf & Lutz Hauptmannsreute 93 D-70193 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 80106977.4 | 12.11.1980 | [1981/20] | Priority number, date | DE19792945607 | 12.11.1979 Original published format: DE 2945607 | [1981/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0028840 | Date: | 20.05.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0028840 | Date: | 22.07.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.1981 | Classification | IPC: | F24D11/02 | [1981/20] | CPC: |
F24D11/0235 (EP,US);
F24S20/66 (EP,US);
Y02B10/20 (EP);
Y02B10/70 (EP);
Y02B30/52 (EP);
Y02E10/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1981/20] | Title | German: | Anordnung zur Einkopplung von Wärme in den Primärkreislauf der Wärmepumpe einer Wärmepumpen-Heizanlage | [1981/20] | English: | Arrangement for introducing heat into the primary circuit of the heat pump of a reverse-cycle heating installation | [1981/20] | French: | Disposition pour l'admission de chaleur au circuit primaire d'une installation de chauffage à pompe à chaleur | [1981/20] | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 16.04.1982 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1982/39] | 26.06.1982 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1982/39] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2605117 (WEISS HANS); | [A]FR2414694 (PARICA [FR]); | FR2403523 [ ] (PARICA [FR]); | GB652777 [ ] (BRITISH THOMSON HOUSTON CO LTD); | GB1288700 [ ]; | DE2412669 [ ] (DKK SCHARFENSTEIN VEB); | US4170221 [ ] (GAVIN JOSEPH G [US]); | FR2396938 [ ] (BOURGAREL LUCIEN [FR]); | [P]DE2843996 (BOETTCHER ALFRED) | [ ] - DE INGENIEUR, Band 90, Nr. 36, September 1978, Seiten 669-680 Den HaagNL. D.F. WINNEN: "Zonnewarmtecollectoren en warmtepompen" * Seite 678; Figur 17 * |