EP0029218 - Clamping device for printing formes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.01.1983 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DR.-ING. RUDOLF HELL GmbH Grenzstrasse 1-5 D-24149 Kiel / DE | [1981/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fels, Werner Forstweg 64 D-2300 Kiel 1 / DE | [1981/21] | Application number, filing date | 80106994.9 | 13.11.1980 | [1981/21] | Priority number, date | DE19792946597 | 19.11.1979 Original published format: DE 2946597 | [1981/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0029218 | Date: | 27.05.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.1981 | Classification | IPC: | B41F27/12 | [1981/21] | CPC: |
B41F27/1262 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1981/21] | Title | German: | Aufspannvorrichtung für Druckformplatten | [1981/21] | English: | Clamping device for printing formes | [1981/21] | French: | Dispositif de serrage de clichés | [1981/21] | File destroyed: | 18.06.1989 | Examination procedure | 24.04.1981 | Examination requested [1981/27] | 13.04.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.1982 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1983/12] | 10.12.1982 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1983/12] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1982 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2626503 [ ] (DECKER PETER DIPL ING DR ING); | FR2257427 [ ] (HOUDAILLE INDUSTRIES INC [US]); | DE1561082 [ ] (ALBERT SCHNELLPRESSEN); | US2579517 [ ] (ROWELL GEORGE S, et al); | GB1161393 [ ] (GESTETNER LTD [GB]) |