EP0029956 - A tool for closing a bore with a closure element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1981/23] | Method of closing a threaded bore in the flange of a reactor pressure vessel, and device for carrying out the method | ||
[1984/48] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.10.1985 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.12.1985 [1985/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BROWN BOVERI REAKTOR GmbH Dudenstrasse 44 D-6800 Mannheim 1 / DE | [1981/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dietrich, Alban, Ing. grad. Moltkestrasse 34 D-6733 Hassloch / DE | [1981/23] | Representative(s) | Dahlmann, Gerhard, et al c/o Brown Boveri & Cie., AG Zentralbereich ZPT/P Postfach 351 D-6800 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/21] | Dahlmann, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing., et al c/o Brown Boveri & Cie., AG Zentralbereich ZPT/P Postfach 351 D-6800 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 80107182.0 | 19.11.1980 | [1981/23] | Priority number, date | DE19792948663 | 04.12.1979 Original published format: DE 2948663 | [1981/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0029956 | Date: | 10.06.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0029956 | Date: | 28.11.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.1981 | Classification | IPC: | G21C13/02, B25B27/00 | [1981/23] | CPC: |
B25B27/0028 (EP);
G21C13/028 (EP);
Y02E30/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, FR, IT, LI [1981/23] | Title | German: | Werkzeug zum Verschliessen einer Bohrung mit einem Verschlusselement | [1984/48] | English: | A tool for closing a bore with a closure element | [1984/48] | French: | Outil pour fermer un trou avec un élément de fermeture | [1984/48] |
Former [1981/23] | Verfahren zum Verschliessen einer im Flansch eines Reaktordruckbehälters angebrachten Gewindebohrung und Vorrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens | ||
Former [1981/23] | Method of closing a threaded bore in the flange of a reactor pressure vessel, and device for carrying out the method | ||
Former [1981/23] | Procédé de fermeture d'un trou taraudé dans un rebord d'une cuve de réacteur, et dispositif pour la mise en oeuvre dudit procédé | Examination procedure | 07.12.1981 | Examination requested [1982/07] | 14.09.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.05.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.08.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1614512 [ ] (SULZER AG) | Examination | US3175727 | GB2008710 |