EP0030390 - Sound synthesizer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.01.1988 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.03.1988 [1988/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1981/24] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oura, Toshio c/o Nippon Electric Co., Ltd. 33-1, Shiba Gochome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1981/24] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/13] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 D-80058 München / DE | ||
Former [1981/24] | Glawe, Richard, Dr. Ing. Liebherrstrasse 20 D-8000 München 26 / DE | Application number, filing date | 80107781.9 | 10.12.1980 | [1981/24] | Priority number, date | JP19790159909 | 10.12.1979 Original published format: JP 15990979 | [1981/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0030390 | Date: | 17.06.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0030390 | Date: | 25.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.1981 | Classification | IPC: | G10L5/02, G10L7/02 | [1987/13] | CPC: |
G10L13/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1981/24] | G10L1/08 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1981/24] | Title | German: | Schallsynthetisator | [1981/24] | English: | Sound synthesizer | [1981/24] | French: | Synthétiseur de sons | [1981/24] | Examination procedure | 27.10.1981 | Examination requested [1982/01] | 20.07.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.12.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.06.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.12.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 04.07.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.12.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2519483 [ ] (MOZER FORREST SHRAGO) | Examination | US3515792 | US4163120 | US4214125 | EP0017341 |