EP0034216 - Hydraulic motor control device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.1985 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.03.1985 [1985/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mannesmann Rexroth GmbH Jahnstrasse 3 - 5 97813 Lohr / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/34] | For all designated states Mannesmann Rexroth GmbH Jahnstrasse 3 - 5 D-97813 Lohr / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Müller, Albert Inselstrasse 7 D-8750 Aschaffenburg / DE | [1981/34] | Representative(s) | Bartels und Partner, Patentanwälte Lange Strasse 51 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/28] | Patentanwälte Bartels, Held und Partner Lange Strasse 51 D-70174 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1981/34] | Fink, Heinrich, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Phys. H. Bartels Dipl.-Ing. H. Fink, Dr.-Ing. M. Held Dipl.-Ing. M. Bartels Lange Strasse 51 D-70174 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 80107885.8 | 13.12.1980 | [1981/34] | Priority number, date | DE19803001167 | 15.01.1980 Original published format: DE 3001167 | [1981/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0034216 | Date: | 26.08.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0034216 | Date: | 14.03.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.1981 | Classification | IPC: | F16H39/50, F04B49/08 | [1981/34] | CPC: |
F04B49/08 (EP);
F16H61/46 (EP);
F16H61/472 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, FR, IT, LI [1981/34] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Steuern eines Hydromotors | [1981/34] | English: | Hydraulic motor control device | [1981/34] | French: | Moyen de commande pour moteur hydraulique | [1981/34] | Examination procedure | 02.09.1981 | Examination requested [1981/45] | 24.06.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.03.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 25.07.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.12.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3901032 [ ] | Examination | DE2551088 | US3747350 | US3954047 | DE2049884 | DE2459550 |