Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
14.05.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.07.1986 [1986/27] |
11.05.1985 | (Expected) grant | published on 10.07.1985 [1985/28] |
22.02.1982 | Request for examination filed | published on 28.04.1982 [1982/17] |
30.05.1981 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 29.07.1981 [1981/30] |