EP0032563 - A process for increasing the lithium content obtained from lithium solutions using lithium aluminates/resin composites [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.08.1983 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Dow Chemical Company 2020 Dow Center Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/30] | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center Abbott Road P.O. Box 1967 Midland Michigan 48640-1967 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Repsher, Wendy Joan 317 South Yaupon Lake Jackson Texas / US | 02 /
Rapstein, Kirby Thomas Route 2 Box 2633 Brazoria Texas / US | [1981/30] | Representative(s) | Casalonga, Axel, et al Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/21] | Casalonga, Axel, et al BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Morassistrasse 8 D-80469 München / DE | ||
Former [1981/30] | Casalonga, Axel BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA OFFICE JOSSE & PETIT Baaderstrasse 12-14 D-8000 München 5 / DE | Application number, filing date | 80108004.5 | 18.12.1980 | [1981/30] | Priority number, date | US19790106961 | 26.12.1979 Original published format: US 106961 | [1981/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0032563 | Date: | 29.07.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.1981 | Classification | IPC: | B01J41/08, C01D15/02, C22B26/12, C22B3/00, B01J41/04 | [1981/30] | CPC: |
C01D15/04 (EP,US);
B01J41/07 (EP,US);
B01J41/08 (EP,US);
B01J47/016 (EP,US);
C01D3/145 (EP,US);
C22B26/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1981/30] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Erhöhung des Lithiumgehalts von Lithiumlösungen durch Anwendung von Lithiumaluminat/Kunstharz-Zusammensetzungen | [1981/30] | English: | A process for increasing the lithium content obtained from lithium solutions using lithium aluminates/resin composites | [1981/30] | French: | Procédé pour augmenter la teneur en lithium de solutions de lithium en utilisant des résines composites contenant de l'aluminate de lithium | [1981/30] | File destroyed: | 18.06.1989 | Examination procedure | 28.01.1982 | Examination requested [1982/13] | 08.06.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.12.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.05.1983 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1983/43] | 23.07.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1983/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4159311 [ ] (BAUMAN WILLIAM C [US], et al) |