EP0032236 - Dishwashing detergent [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.1985 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.03.1985 [1985/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/21] | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1981/29] | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien -Patentabteilung- Postfach 1100 Henkelstrasse 67 D-4000 Düsseldorf 1 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaufmann, Jochen, Dr. Wiesbadener Strasse 3 D-4000 Düsseldorf 1 / DE | 02 /
Altenschöpfer, Theodor, Dr. Am Falder 95 D-4000 Düsseldorf 13 / DE | 03 /
Schumann, Klaus, Dr. Matthias-Claudius-Strasse 2 D-4006 Erkrath 1 / DE | 04 /
Rings, Friedel Ulrich-v.-Hassel-Strasse 12 D-4019 Monheim 2 / DE | [1981/29] | Application number, filing date | 80108195.1 | 24.12.1980 | [1981/29] | Priority number, date | DE19803000981 | 12.01.1980 Original published format: DE 3000981 | DE19803007998 | 01.03.1980 Original published format: DE 3007998 | [1981/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0032236 | Date: | 22.07.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0032236 | Date: | 15.02.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/395, C11D3/28, C11D3/08 | [1981/29] | CPC: |
C11D3/3955 (EP,US);
C11D3/28 (EP,US);
C11D7/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1981/29] | Title | German: | Geschirreinigungsmittel | [1981/29] | English: | Dishwashing detergent | [1981/29] | French: | Détergent pour le lavage de la vaisselle | [1981/29] | Examination procedure | 29.10.1981 | Examination requested [1982/02] | 08.07.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.07.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.11.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1167473 [ ] (AZOTE OFFICE NAT IND); | US3166513 [ ] (MIZUNO WILLIAM G, et al); | DE2219804 [ ] (KNAPSACK AG); | DE2340910 [ ] (PROCTER & GAMBLE); | DE2358249 [ ] (FMC CORP) |