EP0038876 - 2,6-Di-tertiary butyl phenyl pentaerythritol spiro bis-phosphites enhancing the stability to heat and light of synthetic resins, stabilizer compositions comprising phenolic antioxidants and such phosphites, and synthetic resin compositions containing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.1985 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADEKA ARGUS CHEMICAL CO., Ltd. 1498 Shirahata, Urawa City Saitama Prefecture / JP | [1981/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Minagawa, Motonobu 1-207-3 Shichizacho Koshigaya City Saitama Pref. / JP | 02 /
Nakahara, Yutaka 406-71 Ninamishimoarai Iwatsuki-City Saitama Pref. / JP | [1981/44] | Representative(s) | Schmied-Kowarzik, Volker, et al Patentanwälte Dr. V. Schmied-Kowarzik Dipl.-Ing. G. Dannenberg Dr. P. Weinhold Dr. D. Gudel Dipl.-Ing. S. Schubert Dr. P. Barz Siegfriedstrasse 8 80803 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/04] | Schmied-Kowarzik, Volker, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dr. V. Schmied-Kowarzik Dipl.-Ing. G. Dannenberg Dr. P. Weinhold Dr. D. Gudel Dipl.-Ing. S. Schubert Dr. P. Barz Siegfriedstrasse 8 D-80803 München / DE | ||
Former [1981/44] | Schmied-Kowarzik, Volker, Dr. Patentanwälte Dr. V. Schmied-Kowarzik Dipl.-Ing. G. Dannenberg Dr. P. Weinhold Dr. D. Gudel Dipl.-Ing. S. Schubert Siegfriedstrasse 8 D-8000 München 40 / DE | Application number, filing date | 80108236.3 | 29.12.1980 | [1981/44] | Priority number, date | JP19800056594 | 28.04.1980 Original published format: JP 5659480 | [1981/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0038876 | Date: | 04.11.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0038876 | Date: | 10.10.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/15, C08K5/52 | [1981/44] | CPC: |
C08K5/527 (EP,US);
C07F9/65746 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/00, C08K5/13, C08K5/52 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1981/44] | Title | German: | 2,6-Di-tertio-butyl-phenyl-pentaerythritol-spiro-bis-phosphite, die die Beständigkeit gegen Wärme und Licht synthetischer Harze erhöhen, Stabilisatorzusammensetzungen, die phenolische Antioxidantien und solche Phosphite enthalten, und synthetische Harzzusammensetzungen, die solche Zusammensetzungen enthalten | [1981/44] | English: | 2,6-Di-tertiary butyl phenyl pentaerythritol spiro bis-phosphites enhancing the stability to heat and light of synthetic resins, stabilizer compositions comprising phenolic antioxidants and such phosphites, and synthetic resin compositions containing the same | [1981/44] | French: | Bis-phosphites de di-tertiobutyl-2,6 phényl spiro pentaérythritol augmentant la stabilité à la chaleur et la lumière des résines synthétiques, compositions stabilisantes contenant des antioxydants phénoliques et de tels phosphites, et compositions de résines synthétiques contenant de telles compositions | [1981/44] | Examination procedure | 30.04.1982 | Examination requested [1982/28] | 08.09.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.03.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.10.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.03.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.07.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.10.1984 | IT | 10.10.1984 | SE | 10.10.1984 | [2007/44] |
Former [1999/42] | AT | 10.10.1984 | |
IT | 10.10.1984 | ||
SE | 10.10.1984 | ||
Former [1989/16] | AT | 10.10.1984 | |
SE | 10.10.1984 | ||
Former [1985/25] | AT | 10.10.1984 | Documents cited: | Search | JP54043952 [ ]; | [D]US2997454 (LEISTNER WILLIAM E, et al); | [D]US3047608 (LESTER FRIEDMAN, et al); | [D]US3053878 (LESTER FRIEDMAN, et al); | [D]US3255136 (HECKER ARTHUR C, et al); | [D]US3305520 (GERHARD FRITZ, et al); | [D]US3907517 (MINAGAWA MOTONOBU, et al); | GB1526603 [ ] (BORG WARNER) | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 91, No. 12, September 17, 1979, page 38, Abstract 92485s Columbus, Ohio, USA & JP-A-54 043952 (Adeka Argus Chemical Co. Ltd.) (06-04-1979) * Abstract *, & JP54043952 A 00000000 |