EP0019342 - Precision pressed glass object, glass, method of preparing glass [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1980/24] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Joormann, Hendrik Jacobus Maria c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Verweij, Hendrik c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
Haisma, Jan c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1980/24] | Representative(s) | Grever, Frederik, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1980/24] | Grever, Frederik, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 80200445.7 | 13.05.1980 | [1980/24] | Priority number, date | NL19790003914 | 18.05.1979 Original published format: NL 7903914 | [1980/24] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0019342 | Date: | 26.11.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0019342 | Date: | 29.09.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.1980 | Classification | IPC: | C03C3/16, G02B1/00 | [1980/24] | CPC: |
G02B1/00 (EP,US);
C03C3/17 (EP,US);
C03C3/247 (EP,US);
Y10S359/90 (EP,US);
Y10S501/90 (EP,US);
Y10S501/903 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1980/24] | Title | German: | Präzisionsgepresster Glasgegenstand, Glas und Verfahren zur Glasherstellung | [1980/24] | English: | Precision pressed glass object, glass, method of preparing glass | [1980/24] | French: | Objet en verre moulé avec précision, verre et procédé de préparation de ce verre | [1980/24] | Examination procedure | 07.10.1980 | Examination requested [1981/01] | 21.04.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.06.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 23.03.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.06.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR1538674 [ ] (JENAER GLASWERK SCHOTT & GEN); | US3485646 [ ] (JUNGE ALBERT E); | FR2182149 [ ] (ICI LTD [GB]); | DE2317800 [ ] (INST RADIOTEKH ELEKTRON) |