EP0019970 - Conditioning shampoo [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 24.11.1987 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.1987 | Revocation of patent | published on 13.01.1988 [1988/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY 301 East Sixth Street Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1980/25] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY 301 East Sixth Street Cincinnati Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dixon, Thomas Jefferson Hartwood Drive Cincinnati, Ohio 45240 / US | 02 /
Uchtman, Vernon Albert 21 Avenell Lane Greenhills, Ohio 45218 / US | [1980/25] | Representative(s) | Brooks, Maxim Courtney, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1980/25] | Brooks, Maxim Courtney, et al Procter & Gamble Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | Application number, filing date | 80200466.3 | 19.05.1980 | [1980/25] | Priority number, date | US19790041656 | 23.05.1979 Original published format: US 41656 | [1980/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0019970 | Date: | 10.12.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0019970 | Date: | 19.10.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.1980 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/08 | [1980/25] | CPC: |
A61K8/463 (EP);
A61K8/361 (EP);
A61Q5/02 (EP);
A61Q5/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1980/25] | Title | German: | Shampoo mit konditionierenden Eigenschaften | [1980/25] | English: | Conditioning shampoo | [1980/25] | French: | Shampooing conditionnant pour cheveux | [1980/25] | Examination procedure | 01.06.1981 | Examination requested [1981/33] | 12.05.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.11.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.04.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.07.1984
10.08.1984
ADMISSIBLE Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien TFP / Patentabteilung D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/39] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.07.1984
10.08.1984
ADMISSIBLE Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien TFP / Patentabteilung D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | 20.08.1984 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 27.12.1984 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 23.01.1985 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.1985 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 20.05.1987 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.08.1987 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 04.08.1987 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 14.08.1987 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1988/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR1568467 [ ]; | CH490853 [ ]; | FR1296934 [ ]; | US3886277 [ ]; | DE1146996 [ ] |